Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bartolomé Cardinal Martí

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe-Albarracin, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

Administrator of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

Bishop of Toul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1435¹Born
27 Sep 147338.7AppointedBishop of Segorbe-Albarracin, Spain
19 Feb 149661.1Elevated to Cardinal
24 Feb 149661.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
2 Mar 149762.1AppointedAdministrator of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
21 Nov 149863.8ResignedBishop of Segorbe-Albarracin, Spain
1499²64.0AppointedBishop of Toul, France
1 Nov 149964.8AppointedBishop of Segorbe-Albarracin, Spain
25 Mar 150065.2DiedBishop of Segorbe-Albarracin, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé Martí
Bartolomé Cardinal Martí (born 1435, died ) Bishop of Segorbe-Albarracin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Diocese of Valencia
Death PlaceCampo Marzio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Vatican, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 4.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Feb 1496
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1473, Number 36*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 234, and Page 101
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Nov 2018

Quantcast