Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel de los Santos Serra y Sucarrats

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1868Born
16 Apr 189224.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 192254.9AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
7 Oct 192355.7Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
16 Jan 193668.0AppointedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
9 Aug 193668.5DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel de los Santos Serra y Sucarrats
Bishop Miguel de los Santos Serra y Sucarrats (born , died ) Bishop of Segorbe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlot

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast