Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodrigo Marín y Rubio

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1659²BornTíjola
24 Sep 170849.7AppointedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
Feb 1709³50.0Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe, Spain
7 Mar 171455.1SelectedBishop of Jaén, Spain
28 May 171455.4ConfirmedBishop of Jaén, Spain
10 Feb 173273.1DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo Marín y Rubio:
Bishop Rodrigo Marín y Rubio (born 1659, died ) Bishop of Jaén

  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 27, Number 62
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 210, and Page 351

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 13 Aug 2015