Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anastasio Vives de Rocamora, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Segorbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1599BornOrihuela
17 May 161617.0ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
24 Dec 166061.6SelectedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
30 May 166162.0ConfirmedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
9 Oct 166162.3Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe, Spain
6 Dec 167273.5ResignedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
20 May 167980.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Segorbe, Spain

MicroData Summary for Anastasio Vives de Rocamora:
Bishop Anastasio Vives de Rocamora O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Segorbe

  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 194, Number 1,216
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 311
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1661, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015