Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Gerart y Vernomen

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
22 May 1438Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe-Albarracin, Spain
2 Jul 1445AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
22 Oct 1456DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Jaime Gerart y Vernomen
Bishop Jaime Gerart y Vernomen (died ) Bishop of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 234, and Page 102
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,993
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 307, Number 184

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast