Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Serrano Sotomayor, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1582¹BornChillón
4 Sep 163250.6AppointedMaster General of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
3 Dec 163553.9AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
21 Dec 163553.9ResignedMaster General of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
23 Mar 163654.2Ordained BishopBishop of Solsona, Spain
30 May 163957.4AppointedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
29 Apr 165270.3AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
5 Oct 165270.7DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Serrano Sotomayor:
Bishop Diego Serrano Sotomayor O. de M. (died ) Bishop of Guadix

  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 144, and Page 311
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 198
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 163, Number 1,024
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Mar 2015