Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Ferrer

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Sep 1459AppointedBishop of Segorbe-Albarracin, Spain
27 Dec 1460AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
16 Nov 1461Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
13 Feb 1467AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
17 Jun 1475DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Ferrer:
Archbishop Francesco Ferrer (died ) Bishop of Mallorca

  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 184, and Page 114
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 234
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,204
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1500, Page 308, Number 190
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014