Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Muñoz Baquerizo

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1668¹BornPinto
7 Mar 171446.1SelectedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
9 Jul 171446.5ConfirmedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
28 Oct 171446.8Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe, Spain
19 Nov 1730³62.8DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Muñoz Baquerizo:
Bishop Diego Muñoz Baquerizo (born 1668, died ) Bishop of Segorbe

  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,515
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 351
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 31, Number 85
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015