Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Cases Deordal

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Segorbe-Castellón de la Plana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1919BornVic
19 Mar 194323.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 197152.0AppointedBishop of Segorbe-Castellón de la Plana, Spain
6 Feb 197252.1Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe-Castellón de la Plana, Spain
22 Feb 199676.2RetiredBishop of Segorbe-Castellón de la Plana, Spain
21 Apr 200282.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Segorbe-Castellón de la Plana, Spain

MicroData Summary for José María Cases Deordal:
Bishop José María Cases Deordal (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Segorbe-Castellón de la Plana

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013