Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Conza-Nusco-Bisaccia

Archidioecesis Sancti Angeli de Lombardis-Compsanus-Nuscanus-Bisaciensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Pasquale Cascio, Archbishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • United: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Benevento
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 1,290 (498 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Campania
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesisantangelo.it/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Arcivescovile, Via Belvedere 1, 83054 Sant'Angelo dei Lombardi [Avellino], Italia
  • Telephone: 0827.23.039
  • Fax: 0827.21.61.14

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Conza
8th CenturyErectedDiocese of Conza (erected)
Archdiocese of Conza
11th CenturyElevatedDiocese of Conza Archdiocese of Conza
Archdiocese of Conza e Campagna
27 June 1818UnitedArchdiocese of Conza
Diocese of Satriano e Campagna
Archdiocese of Conza e Campagna
30 September 1921SplitArchdiocese of Conza e Campagna Diocese of Campagna
Archdiocese of Conza-Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Bisaccia
30 September 1921UnitedArchdiocese of Conza e Campagna
Diocese of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia
Archdiocese of Conza-Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Bisaccia
Archdiocese of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Conza-Nusco-Bisaccia
30 September 1986UnitedArchdiocese of Conza-Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Bisaccia
Diocese of Nusco
Archdiocese of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Conza-Nusco-Bisaccia

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Conza-Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Bisaccia
195091,64691,89899.7%5810681,347107322ap1951
197083,76585,50098.0%6013731,147199224ap1971
198062,20063,20098.4%3821591,054258022ap1981
Archdiocese of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Conza-Nusco-Bisaccia
199092,80093,00099.8%4517621,4961811740ap1991
1999101,500103,00098.5%3825631,6111317845ap2000
200088,50089,82598.5%3925641,3821478345ap2001
200188,50089,82598.5%4027671,3201578345ap2002
200285,00085,47999.4%3830681,2502578345ap2003
200385,00085,47099.5%3730671,2682708645ap2004
200484,50085,00099.4%4126671,2612507835ap2005
201083,00083,50099.4%4124651,2761357336ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 11 Aug 2014