Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ercole Rangoni

Deceased

Archbishop of Conza


Events

DateEventTitle
2 May 1622AppointedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
17 May 1622Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
24 Apr 1645AppointedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
13 Feb 1650DiedArchbishop of Conza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ercole Rangoni:
Archbishop Ercole Rangoni (died ) Archbishop of Conza

  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 84, and Page 160
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 76, Number 445

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013