Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Paolo Nicolai

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Conza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1657Born
21 Jul 170446.9AppointedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
3 Aug 170447.0Ordained BishopBishop of Capaccio, Italy
2 Sep 171659.1AppointedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
7 Apr 173173.7ResignedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
11 Aug 173174.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Conza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Paolo Nicolai
Archbishop Francesco Paolo Nicolai (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Conza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAltamura

  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 142, and Page 167
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast