Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gregorio De Luca

Deceased

Archbishop of Conza e Campagna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1801BornSan Costantino di Francica
20 Sep 182322.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jan 185048.8SelectedArchbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy
20 May 185049.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy
15 Aug 187877.4DiedArchbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gregorio De Luca:
Archbishop Gregorio De Luca (born , died ) Archbishop of Conza e Campagna

  • a priest for 54.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 219

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013