Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Conti

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Conza

Cardinal-Priest of San Vitale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1470BornRoma
8 Oct 149424.8AppointedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
1 Jul 151747.5Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 151747.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
11 Sep 151747.7ResignedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
29 Jun 152151.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Conza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Conti:
Cardinal Francesco Conti (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Conza

  • a cardinal for 4.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 175

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013