Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Niccol˛ Cardinal Caetani di Sermoneta

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1526Born
22 Dec 153610.8Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
5 Mar 153711.0AppointedAdministrator of Bisignano, Italy
13 Mar 153812.0Elevated to Cardinal
16 Apr 153812.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
8 Aug 153913.4AppointedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
5 May 154620.2AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
13 Mar 154923.0ResignedAdministrator of Bisignano, Italy
14 Jul 155024.3AppointedAdministrator of Quimper, France
9 Mar 155226.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
5 Apr 156034.1ResignedAdministrator of Quimper, France
1 May 158559.1DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccol˛ Caetani di Sermoneta
Niccol˛ Cardinal Caetani di Sermoneta (born , died ) Archbishop of Capua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Santuario della Santa Casa, Loreto

  • a cardinal for 48.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1536
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 134, and Page 175
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1552, Number 27*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 6 Oct 2017