Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino di Milia, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Larino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1839Born
22 Sep 186424.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
27 Mar 188444.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thabraca
13 May 188444.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Dominican Republic
13 May 188444.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Haiti
13 May 188444.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Venezuela
10 Aug 188444.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thabraca
Nov 1890³51.0ResignedApostolic Delegate to Dominican Republic
Nov 1890³51.0ResignedApostolic Delegate to Haiti
Nov 189051.0ResignedApostolic Delegate to Venezuela
4 Jun 189151.6AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
6 Apr 191070.4DiedBishop of Larino, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino di Milia (VIAF: 88992213)
Bishop Bernardino di Milia O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Larino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalitri
Ordained BishopSaint Pierre de la Martinique, Diocese of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Antilles
Death PlaceLarino, Diocese of Larino

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 334, and Page 543
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 39
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 139, and Page 221, and Page 261

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast