Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaspard de Diano

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1389¹Born
30 Jun 141223.5AppointedBishop of Teano, Italy
20 May 142233.4AppointedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
21 Feb 143849.1AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
29 Apr 145162.3DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspard de Diano:
Archbishop Gaspard de Diano (died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 203, and Page 481
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 200

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013