Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Nicolai

Deceased

Archbishop of Conza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1695Born
21 Dec 172025.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 173136.2AppointedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
22 Apr 173136.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Conza, Italy
27 Oct 175863.8DiedArchbishop of Conza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Nicolai
Archbishop Giuseppe Nicolai (born , died ) Archbishop of Conza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAltamura

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 176
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast