Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Maria Scanzano

Deceased

Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1777³BornAndretta
29 Mar 180022.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jan 183759.1SelectedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
19 May 183759.4ConfirmedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
4 Jun 183759.5Ordained BishopBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
6 Jan 184971.1DiedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maria Scanzano:
Bishop Angelo Maria Scanzano (born , died ) Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 141
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,636

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013