Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ambrogio Catarino Politi, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Conza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1484BornSiena
27 Aug 154662.7AppointedBishop of Minori, Italy
21 Dec 154663.0Ordained BishopBishop of Minori, Italy
3 Jun 155268.4AppointedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
8 Nov 155369.9DiedArchbishop of Conza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio Catarino Politi:
Archbishop Ambrogio Catarino Politi O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Conza

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 246, and Page 175
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,628
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013