Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gioacchino Maria Mancusi (Mancuso)

Deceased

Archbishop of Conza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1747BornNapoli
25 May 177124.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 180558.0AppointedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
30 Jun 180558.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Conza, Italy
1811¹63.6DiedArchbishop of Conza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gioacchino Maria Mancusi (Mancuso):
Archbishop Gioacchino Maria Mancusi (Mancuso) (born , died 1811) Archbishop of Conza

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1805, Number 13
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 158

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015