Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcello Capano Orsini

Deceased

Archbishop of Conza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1710BornPolleca
21 Mar 173323.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 175948.9AppointedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
18 Feb 175948.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Conza, Italy
28 Jun 176555.3DiedArchbishop of Conza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marcello Capano Orsini:
Archbishop Marcello Capano Orsini (born , died ) Archbishop of Conza

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1762
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013