Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Fabio Lagonissa

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585¹BornNapoli
25 Dec 162137.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 162237.1AppointedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
24 Feb 162237.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Conza, Italy
20 Nov 163449.9AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
1645²60.0ResignedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
1652¹67.0DiedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabio Lagonissa:
Patriarch Fabio Lagonissa Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 30.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 160, and Page 86
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 74, Number 437

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013