Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Piccirilli

Deceased

Archbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1855Born
15 Jun 187822.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 189641.1AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
6 Dec 189641.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
14 Nov 190449.0AppointedArchbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy
25 Apr 191862.5AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy
4 Mar 193983.3DiedArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Piccirilli
Archbishop Nicola Piccirilli (born , died ) Archbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChieti, Archdiocese of Chieti
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 42.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 515
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017