Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Conti

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Conza

Cardinal-Priest of San Vitale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1414BornRome
26 Jan 145541.0AppointedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
15 Nov 148369.8Elevated to Cardinal
15 Nov 148369.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
19 Nov 148369.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
1 Oct 148470.7ResignedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
18 Oct 148571.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Adriano al Foro
9 Mar 148975.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
20 Oct 149379.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Conza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Conti:
Giovanni Cardinal Conti (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Conza

  • a cardinal for 9.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Nov 1483

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015