Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Périgueux (-Sarlat)

Dioecesis Petrocoricensis (-Sarlatensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Philippe Mousset, Bishop
  • Michel Pierre Marie Mouïsse, Bishop Emeritus
  • Gaston Élie Poulain, P.S.S., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 17 June 1854
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bordeaux (-Bazas)
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 9,225 (3,563 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sud-Ouest
  • Official Web Site: http://catholic-dordogne.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: 22 rue Paul-Louis-Courier, B.P. 5064, 24005 Perigueux CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 5.53.08.07.44
  • Fax: 5.53.54.03.25

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Périgueux (Vesuna)
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Périgueux (Vesuna) (erected)
11 July 1317Territory LostDiocese of Périgueux (Vesuna) Diocese of Sarlat (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Périgueux (Vesuna) (suppressed) Diocese of Angoulême
Diocese of Périgueux
6 October 1822RestoredDiocese of Angoulême Diocese of Périgueux
Diocese of Périgueux (-Sarlat)
17 June 1854Name ChangedDiocese of Périgueux Diocese of Périgueux (-Sarlat)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Périgueux (-Sarlat)
1950381,000386,00098.7%334253591,06140536ap1951
1969360,000374,07396.2%229262551,41128520126ap1971
1980367,000374,00098.1%180422221,653174420538ap1981
1990387,000395,00098.0%146261722,250464332538ap1991
1999303,000394,00076.9%130181482,04775227530ap2000
2000304,000396,00076.8%133151482,05494927030ap2001
2001305,000396,00077.0%130171472,07495324030ap2002
2002280,000390,00071.8%123161392,01495222030ap2003
2003290,000390,00074.4%122151372,11695519130ap2004
2004290,000390,00074.4%101161172,478114221430ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 18 Jun 2014