Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel-Louis de Grossoles de Flamarens

Deceased

Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1736Born
7 Jul 177236.4SelectedBishop of Quimper, France
14 Dec 177236.8ConfirmedBishop of Quimper, France
17 Jan 177336.9Ordained BishopBishop of Quimper, France
17 Apr 177337.1SelectedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
14 Jun 177337.3ConfirmedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
3 Jul 181579.4DiedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel-Louis de Grossoles de Flamarens
Bishop Emmanuel-Louis de Grossoles de Flamarens (born , died ) Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAngers

  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • ab/ob: CB, 10 Nov 2015
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 184, and Page 334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast