Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Clément

Deceased

Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1646BornBesançon
167832.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jun 170256.4SelectedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
25 Sep 170256.7ConfirmedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
29 Oct 170256.8Ordained BishopBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
6 Jan 171973.0DiedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Clément:
Bishop Pierre Clément (died ) Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna)

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 312

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013