Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philibert de Brandon

Deceased

Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Sep 1648AppointedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
22 Nov 1648Ordained BishopBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
13 Jul 1652DiedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France

MicroData Summary for Philibert de Brandon
Bishop Philibert de Brandon (died ) Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoulins

  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 277
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,648, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast