Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cyr de Villers-la-Faye

Deceased

Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Aug 1652SelectedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
21 Jul 1653ConfirmedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
31 Aug 1653Ordained BishopBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
4 May 1665DiedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France

MicroData Summary for Cyr de Villers-la-Faye
Bishop Cyr de Villers-la-Faye (died ) Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBourgogne

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 277
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1653, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast