Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Julien-Émile Patria

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Périgueux (-Sarlat)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1915BornFontaine-Chaâlis
8 Oct 193924.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 196246.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
30 Apr 196246.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Uthina
19 Jun 196246.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uthina
3 Aug 196549.9AppointedBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
15 Oct 198873.1ResignedBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
11 Aug 200185.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Julien-Émile Patria:
Bishop Jacques-Julien-Émile Patria (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Périgueux (-Sarlat)

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 81
  • op: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2001, Page 463
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013