Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Jacoupy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Agen, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1761Born
178624.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 180241.2SelectedBishop of Agen, France
15 Jul 180241.2ConfirmedBishop of Agen, France
18 Jul 180241.2Ordained BishopBishop of Agen, France
7 Jul 184180.1RetiredBishop of Agen, France
27 May 184887.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Agen, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Jacoupy
Bishop Jean Jacoupy (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Agen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Martin-de-Ribérac

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 45.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 62
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast