Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaston Élie Poulain, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Périgueux (-Sarlat)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1927BornTruttemer-le-Grand
8 Dec 195124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
24 Aug 198558.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
3 Nov 198558.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
15 Oct 198861.2SucceededBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
5 Mar 200476.6RetiredBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
24 Oct 201588.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France

MicroData Summary for Gaston Élie Poulain:
Bishop Gaston Élie Poulain P.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Périgueux (-Sarlat)

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • d: CB, 26 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015