Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agostino Cardinal Trivulzio

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro

Administrator of Asti

Administrator of Bayeux

Administrator of Périgueux (Vesuna)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1485¹BornMilan, Italy
1 Jul 151732.5Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 151732.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
24 Aug 152035.6AppointedAdministrator of Reggio Calabria, Italy
1 Oct 152035.8ResignedAdministrator of Reggio Calabria, Italy
3 Jun 152136.4AppointedAdministrator of Alessano, Italy
26 Sep 152237.7AppointedAdministrator of Bobbio, Italy
26 Nov 152338.9AppointedAdministrator of Reggio Calabria, Italy
27 May 152439.4ResignedAdministrator of Bobbio, Italy
22 Jun 152439.5AppointedAdministrator of Toulon, France
15 Sep 152540.7AppointedAdministrator of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
8 Oct 152540.8ResignedAdministrator of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
2 May 152641.3AppointedAdministrator of Avranches, France
20 Jul 152641.6ResignedAdministrator of Alessano, Italy
19 Oct 152641.8ResignedAdministrator of Avranches, France
25 Sep 152843.7AppointedAdministrator of Asti, Italy
1529¹44.0ResignedAdministrator of Reggio Calabria, Italy
16 Jul 152944.5ResignedAdministrator of Asti, Italy
6 Oct 153146.8AppointedAdministrator of Bayeux, France
7 Jun 153550.4ResignedAdministrator of Toulon, France
153651.0AppointedAdministrator of Asti, Italy
17 Aug 153752.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
6 Sep 153752.7ResignedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
21 Feb 153954.1AppointedAdministrator of Brugnato, Italy
27 Aug 154156.7AppointedAdministrator of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
5 Mar 154863.2ResignedAdministrator of Brugnato, Italy
30 Mar 154863.2DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Trivulzio:
Cardinal Agostino Trivulzio (died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro

  • a cardinal for 30.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 284, and Page 103
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 121, and Page 141
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013