Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Théodore Baudry

Deceased

Bishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1817BornMontigné-les-Rairies
5 Jun 184123.6Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 186143.3SelectedBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
18 Mar 186143.4ConfirmedBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
5 May 186143.5Ordained BishopBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
14 May 186143.5InstalledBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
28 Mar 186345.4DiedBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Théodore Baudry:
Bishop Charles-Théodore Baudry (born , died ) Bishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat)

  • a priest for 21.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013