Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe Mousset

Bishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1955 BornLe Guâ
22 May 198833.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
8 Jan 200953.6AppointedBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France
15 Mar 200953.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France
18 Jun 201459.1AppointedBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France

MicroData Summary for Philippe Mousset:
Bishop Philippe Mousset (born ) Bishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Périgueux (-Sarlat).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,065
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 18 Jun 2014