Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Amédée Georges-Massonnais

Deceased

Bishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1805Born
13 Jun 182924.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bordeaux, France
20 Aug 184035.3SelectedBishop of Périgueux, France
14 Dec 184035.6ConfirmedBishop of Périgueux, France
21 Feb 184135.8Ordained BishopBishop of Périgueux, France
20 Dec 186055.6DiedBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Amédée Georges-Massonnais (VIAF: 63997060)
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Amédée Georges-Massonnais (born , died ) Bishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Denis-de-Gastines
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bordeaux, Archdiocese of Bordeaux

  • a priest for 31.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 303
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1841, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast