Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Chrétien de Macheco de Prémeaux

Deceased

Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1697Born
25 Dec 173134.6SelectedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
31 Mar 173234.8ConfirmedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
25 May 173235.0Ordained BishopBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
28 Nov 177174.5DiedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Chrétien de Macheco de Prémeaux
Bishop Jean-Chrétien de Macheco de Prémeaux (born , died ) Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDijon

  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast