Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel de Francheville

Deceased

Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1648Born
8 Sep 169345.2SelectedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
9 Nov 169345.3ConfirmedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
17 Jan 169445.5Ordained BishopBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
30 May 169445.9InstalledBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
26 May 170253.9DiedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France

MicroData Summary for Daniel de Francheville
Bishop Daniel de Francheville (born , died ) Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVannes, Diocese of Vannes

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 311
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast