Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Alain de Solminihac, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cahors


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1593BornPérigord
22 Sep 163642.8AppointedBishop of Cahors, France
27 Sep 163743.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
31 Dec 165966.0DiedBishop of Cahors, France
4 Oct 1981Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Alain de Solminihac:
Bishop Bl. Alain de Solminihac O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Cahors

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 142
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1637, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015