Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Louis-Prosper Bougouin

Deceased

Bishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1845BornLa Mothe-Saint-Héraye
25 Oct 186823.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 190661.0AppointedBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
28 Oct 190661.2Ordained BishopBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France
1 Jan 191569.3DiedBishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Louis-Prosper Bougouin:
Bishop Henri-Louis-Prosper Bougouin (born , died ) Bishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat)

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013