Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Lustrac

Deceased

Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Jun 1548SelectedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
17 Aug 1548ConfirmedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
27 Jan 1549Ordained BishopBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
18 Jul 1550³DiedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Lustrac
Bishop Jean de Lustrac (died ) Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSaint-Maurin, Abbey, Saint-Maurin, Diocese of Agen

  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 272
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1549, Number 2
  • c34: CB, 29 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 30 Sep 2017