Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspar Afonso da Costa Brandão

Deceased

Bishop of Funchal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Dec 1703BornAgueda
20 Sep 173228.8Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 175652.6AppointedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
21 Sep 175652.8Ordained BishopBishop of Funchal, Portugal
28 Jan 178480.2DiedBishop of Funchal, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Gaspar Afonso da Costa Brandão:
Bishop Gaspar Afonso da Costa Brandão (died ) Bishop of Funchal

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013