Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim de Nossa Senhora de Nazareth Oliveira e Abreu, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1776Born
17 Dec 181135.5AppointedPrelate of Mozambico, Mozambique
4 Sep 181539.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Leontopolis in Bithynia
3 Nov 181640.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leontopolis in Bithynia
31 Oct 181842.4SelectedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
23 Aug 181943.2ConfirmedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
26 Feb 182447.7SelectedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
3 May 182447.9ConfirmedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
31 Aug 185175.3DiedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Joaquim de Nossa Senhora de Nazareth Oliveira e Abreu
Bishop Joaquim de Nossa Senhora de Nazareth Oliveira e Abreu O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Coimbra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNazaré Pederneira

  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 57
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 155, and Page 236
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017