Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Manuel de Lemos

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1791Born
24 Jun 181625.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Feb 185462.8SelectedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
7 Apr 185463.0ConfirmedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
25 Jun 185463.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
28 May 185665.1SelectedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
18 Sep 185665.5ConfirmedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
27 Sep 185867.5AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
26 Mar 187079.0DiedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Manuel de Lemos
Bishop José Manuel de Lemos (born , died ) Bishop of Coimbra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReiriz
Ordained BishopCathedral, Coimbra, Diocese of Coimbra

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 157, and Page 214
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 593
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast