Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel de Menezes

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Feb 1570AppointedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
16 Dec 1573AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
4 Aug 1578DiedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Menezes
Bishop Manuel de Menezes (died ) Bishop of Coimbra

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 218, and Page 171
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1570, Number 4*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast