Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Alves de Mariz

Deceased

Bishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1844Born
28 Mar 186824.1Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 188541.4SelectedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
30 Jul 188541.4ConfirmedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
15 Nov 188541.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
25 Aug 191268.5DiedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Alves de Mariz (VIAF: 258707538)
Bishop José Alves de Mariz (born , died ) Bishop of Bragança e Miranda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoimbra, Diocese of Coimbra
Ordained BishopEglise des Martyrs, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,102
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 157
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017