Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Rendeiro, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1915BornMurtosa
28 Jul 194024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Dec 195237.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
22 Dec 195237.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Messene
12 Apr 195337.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Messene
3 Dec 195539.9SucceededBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
15 Jul 196549.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal
15 Jul 196549.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Benepota
12 Aug 196751.6SucceededBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
19 May 197155.4DiedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Francisco Rendeiro:
Bishop Francisco Rendeiro O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Coimbra

  • a priest for 30.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015