Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Francisco Moreira dos Santos, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop Emeritus of Uije, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1928 Born
20 Jan 195223.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
14 Mar 196738.4AppointedBishop of Carmona e São Salvador, Angola
30 Apr 196738.5Ordained BishopBishop of Carmona e São Salvador, Angola
2 Feb 200879.3RetiredBishop of Uije, Angola

MicroData Summary for José Francisco Moreira dos Santos
Bishop José Francisco Moreira dos Santos O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Uije

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMata Mourisca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Uije.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast