Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge de Melo

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1577¹BornSerpa
20 Sep 162750.7AppointedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
9 Jun 163659.4AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
2 Oct 163659.7DiedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jorge de Melo:
Bishop Jorge de Melo (died ) Bishop of Coimbra

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 245, and Page 155
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,051
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 2 Mar 2015